THE JEAN LANNING FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity intends to make grants to support projects and research related to improving health services and patient care and will support NHS hospitals, primarily those that form the Southern Health NHS Foundation Trust and, most notably among them, the Romsey Hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 19 October 2020: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christina Bailey | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lee Janaway | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Kisko | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £3.02m | £203.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.08k | £6.50k | £14.15k | £16.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £3.02m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £3.00m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £14.15k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 349 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 JAN 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 OCT 2020 as amended on 06 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
(a) the advancement of health for the public benefit by supporting the Romsey Hospital operated by the Southern Health NHS Foundation Trust and such other National Health Service bodies or organisations supporting the National Health Service, as the trustees shall decide through the provision of grants of financial assistance to fund items and services for patients and service users; and (b) the advancement and promotion of knowledge and education for the public benefit in all aspects of healthcare by providing funds to support medical research, the useful results of which will be published.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BDB Pitmans Llp
1 Bartholomew Close
LONDON
EC1A 7BL
- Phone:
- 03452229222
- Email:
- PennyChapman@bdbpitmans.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window