Accounts and annual returns AWAN FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity number: 1192004
Charity reporting is up to date (23 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 01 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 February 2025 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 September 2024 214 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 February 2025 375 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 February 2023 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 February 2023 27 days late Download Open in new window