CITY HOSPITAL MEDICAL STAFF RESEARCH FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We persuade consultants employed at the Nottingham University Hospitals NHS Trust to donate cremation form payments they earn to this charitable fund.We fund consultants' travel and accomodation costs to attend overseas conferences.We also support junior doctors to attend similar meetings to present their research and help with the costs of binding and submitting their PhD and MD theses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 10 October 1985: Standard registration
- 09 January 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 January 2011: Standard registration
- RESEARCH FUND (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Rahul Basu | Chair | 23 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Kailash Krishnan | Trustee | 06 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.99k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.20k | £0 | £0 | £7.20k | £6.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 July 2024 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 OCTOBER 1983;AMENDED 3 AUGUST 1992.
Charitable objects
(A) TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CITY HOSPITALS. (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST HOSPITAL MEDICAL STAFF BY MAKING GRANTS TO MEMBERS OF THE STAFF WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE THE OBJECTS CLAUSE).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Department of Renal Medicine
City Hospital Campus
NUH NHS Trust
Hucknall Road
Nottingham
NG5 1PB
- Phone:
- 01159691169
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window