BRAINTREE RECREATION CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides facilities for recreation and sports for use by the People of Braintree. This comprises sports fields, hard courts and Gym areas. The Charity currently hosts several local football teams, an armature boxing club and a martial arts club on a regular basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £20,536 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 24 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Smith Farquhar | Chair | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHAUN DEDMAN | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Donna Farquhar | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Steven Robert Thompson | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul McQuillan | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £143.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £15.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £20.54k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 March 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 22 March 2023 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BRAINTREE & BOCKING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hillside
High Street Green
Sible Hedingham
Halstead
CO9 3LH
- Phone:
- 07766953184
- Email:
- info@braintreerec.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window