UK CHINESE WOMEN CONNECT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UK Chinese Women Connect Association aims to bring women in the Chinese community together to reduce the sense of isolation and loneliness, as well as to achieve racial harmony. By regularly organizing online and offline social networking events, also raise the awareness of the good work by other relevant charitable organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 February 2021: CIO registration
- UK CHINESE WOMEN CONNECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Qun Yang | Chair | 07 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Faustina Yang | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Wenjiao Wu | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yinan Zhu | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mengting Shen | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.19k | £26.99k | £20.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.53k | £7.60k | £20.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.75k | £8.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG WOMEN IN THE CHINESE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGINAL AND SOCIAL POSITION, BY PROVIDING: · A NETWORK THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES WOMEN IN THE CHINESE COMMUNITY TO REDUCE ISOLATION AND LONELINESS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY. · WORKSHOPS AND GENERAL SUPPORT TO WOMEN IN THE CHINESE COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Signet Court
Swann Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB5 8LA
- Phone:
- 01223624561
- Email:
- office@ukcwc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window