THE BIKE NETWORK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO HAVE RECEIVED A CANCER DIAGNOSIS INCLUDING THOSE WHO ARE SURVIVORS OF CANCER AND THEIR IMMEDIATE FAMILIES BY: (A) HELPING AND ENCOURAGING THEM TO REBUILD THEIR PHYSICAL FITNESS, STRENGTH, MENTAL WELLNESS AND CONFIDENCE; (B) PROVIDING FREE NEW OR USED BICYCLES AND CYCLING EQUIPMENT TO THE BENEFITING GROUP, AND THEIR DIRECT FAMILY MEMBER
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 November 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Edward Penny | Chair | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Christian Fenwick | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harry Connor Base | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.54k | £59.61k | £62.39k | £49.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.08k | £73.11k | £75.81k | £58.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £934 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 AUG 2020 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 SEP 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO HAVE RECEIVED A CANCER DIAGNOSIS INCLUDING THOSE WHO ARE SURVIVORS OF CANCER AND THEIR IMMEDIATE FAMILIES BY: (A) HELPING AND ENCOURAGING THEM TO REBUILD THEIR PHYSICAL FITNESS, STRENGTH, MENTAL WELLNESS AND CONFIDENCE; (B) PROVIDING FREE NEW OR USED BICYCLES AND CYCLING EQUIPMENT TO THE BENEFITING GROUP, AND THEIR DIRECT FAMILY MEMBERS, TO FACILITATE PHYSICAL EXERCISE AND HEALTHY RECREATION; (C) ORGANISING AND PROMOTING EVENTS TO ENCOURAGE PARTICIPATION IN CYCLING AND TO PROMOTE SOCIAL & MENTAL WELFARE AMONGST THE BENEFITING GROUP; (D) ENCOURAGING SAFE CYCLING BY PROVIDING TRAINING IN CYCLING, CYCLE MAINTENANCE AND ROAD SAFETY; (E) PROVIDING ADVICE AND ENCOURAGEMENT TO TAKE PART IN OTHER FORMS OF EXERCISE TO PROMOTE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL WELLBEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Wolrige Avenue
PLYMOUTH
PL7 2RT
- Phone:
- 01752957772
- Email:
- info@thebikenetwork.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window