THE DANNY MORRIS MEMORIAL TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awards grants yearly to instrumentalists and/or singers of 25 years or under who normally live in Nottinghamshire and are in full-time education. Grants are awarded for instrument purchase, lessons, course fees, accessories, sheet music etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 24 September 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEREK HAYDEN WILEMAN BSc MA | Chair | 01 September 1985 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN WILLIAM BRETNEY | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL IAN NEWTON PhD MSc | Trustee | 24 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS JILL GAUNT | Trustee | 12 March 2006 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Mary Hodgson MCSP MSc | Trustee | 12 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY MORRIS BSc | Trustee | 01 January 1987 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £444 | £2.27k | £1.86k | £2.11k | £3.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.02k | £1.52k | £0 | £1.53k | £1.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY PRACTICE AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC AND MORE PARTICULARLY THE FRENCH HORN AND THE OTHER ARTS IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY THE AWARD OF GRANTS PRIZES SCHOLARSHIPS BURSARIES AND OTHER BENEFITS TO YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25YEARS WHO ARE FOR THE TIME BEING RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE DEED).
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 ARNO VALE ROAD
WOODTHORPE
NOTTINGHAM
NG5 4JJ
- Phone:
- 01159264701
- Email:
- patandjerry@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window