Accounts and annual returns NORTH ESSEX SUPPORT TEAM (N.E.S.T)

Charity number: 1191592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 28 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 28 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 21 November 2024 235 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 21 November 2024 235 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 08 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 21 November 2024 601 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 17 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 12 July 2022 103 days late Download Open in new window