NORTH ESSEX SUPPORT TEAM (N.E.S.T)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
North Essex Support Team assist and supports the poorest and most vulnerable members of our community. This is achieved through donations of furniture, food and clothing. It runs a slow cooker club which supplies and trains people in food in food economics. It also assist in the return to homes from stays in hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £13,900 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 02 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Morrison | Chair | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Robert Nicoll BEM | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Kim Warner | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.97k | £111.20k | £79.58k | £70.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.33k | £59.64k | £56.39k | £66.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £16.00k | £13.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 November 2024 | 235 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 21 November 2024 | 235 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 21 November 2024 | 601 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 12 July 2022 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN NORTH ESSEX, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF THE FOLLOWING ITEMS AND SERVICES FREE OF CHARGE: 1) ESSENTIAL FURNITURE AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS; 2) HOT MEALS AND EMERGENCY FOOD PARCELS; 3) CLOTHING; 4) ADVOCACY SERVICES AND PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE WITH PROBLEMS IN THE HOME; 5) ASSISTANCE WITH AND ADVICE ON HOME SECURITY; 6) SUPPORT WITH HOSPITAL APPOINTMENTS; 7) ASSISTANCE WITH ADAPTATIONS IN THE HOME TO FACILITATE THE RETURN FROM HOSPITAL OF VERY SICK PATIENTS AND THOSE IN RECEIPT OF PALLIATIVE CARE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Deanes Close
Dovercourt
HARWICH
CO12 4JH
- Phone:
- 07779129888
- Email:
- nestassist@gmail.com
- Website:
-
nestassist.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window