RESEARCH ALK+ UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To protect and promote the health of the public through supporting research into the nature, causes, diagnosis, prevention, treatment and cure of anaplastic lymphoma kinase positive (or ALK positive, non-small cell lung cancer).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 December 2020: CIO registration
- RESEARCH ALKAY+ (Working name)
- RESEARCH ALKAY+ve (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aileen Murgatroyd | Chair | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin Blackaby | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
KELVIN FITTON BA FCA | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.62k | £41.45k | £70.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £11.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE, CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF ANAPLASTIC LYMPHOMA KINASE POSITIVE (OR ALK+, NON-SMALL CELL LUNG CANCER
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 BURGHLEY COURT
SPROTBROUGH
DONCASTER
DN5 7DZ
- Phone:
- 07766313895
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window