CHEYLESMORE FOOD HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of assistance to individuals who are in need and/or unable to shop for supplies, primarily by way of grocery bags, household supplies or toiletries
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £45,155 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
Governance
- 28 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Sinclair | Chair | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Rodgers | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Murray Jamieson | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Judi Garland | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.41k | £26.95k | £81.12k | £63.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.37k | £16.57k | £46.27k | £92.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.92k | £47.38k | £45.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 March 2025 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 March 2025 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN COVENTRY BY PROVIDING: ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN COVENTRY BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS OR SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHEYLESMORE FOOD HUB
CHEYLESMORE COMMUNITY CENTRE
POITIERS ROAD
COVENTRY
CV3 5JX
- Phone:
- 07305154869
- Email:
- cheylesmorefoodhub@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window