THE OAKHAM CANAL GREEN CORRIDOR PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The key purpose is to create a footpath alongside the route of the old Oakham Canal from a housing estate on the edge of Oakham extending, initially, about 2km into the countryside. We will be working with landowners to improve the quality of footpaths and signage. We aim to preserve the environment around the Oakham Canal in order to share the economic, environmental and leisure opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rutland
Governance
- 29 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Robert Dadford | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neil Anthony Broad | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Jane Ross | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gary Christian Berridge | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Ball | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.88k | £5.09k | £20.34k | £2.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.57k | £6.78k | £14.72k | £10.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £950 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF RUTLAND AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, THE PROVISION OF AN OUTDOOR PARK FACILITY BASED UPON THE REMAINS OF THE OAKHAM CANAL FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oakham Canal Green Corridor Project
10C Mill Street
Oakham
Rutland
LE15 6EA
- Phone:
- 07870238688
- Email:
- pdadford@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window