QUAD-REBUILD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Values: Rebuild Lives, Rebuild Homes, Rebuilding your Image to Rebuild your Future. Mission statement: To rebuild the lives of people that have required a spinal cord injury through having an accident. To promote social awareness of people affected with spinal cord injury and to raise funds to help mentor people, adapt their homes, rebuild their confidence around their imagine and help mento
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 07 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michaela O'Shea | Trustee | 29 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Cerchione | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joseph English | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.49k | £8.38k | £49.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £3.23k | £8.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 September 2024 | 224 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 September 2024 | 224 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 September 2024 | 589 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 September 2024 | 589 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE AFFECTED WITH A SPINAL CORD INJURY RESIDENT IN CALDERDALE, KIRKLEES, BRADFORD, LEEDS AND WAKEFIELD BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, MENTORING SERVICES AND OTHER FORMS OF SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO ADAPT TO THEIR NEW WAY OF LIVING. (2) TO RELIEVE PEOPLE AFFECTED WITH ACQUIRED SPINAL CORD INJURY RESIDENT IN CALDERDALE, KIRKLEES, BRADFORD, LEEDS AND WAKEFIELD, WHO ARE IN NEED BY PROVIDING AIDS AND ADAPTATIONS TO HOUSING, EQUIPMENT AND SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Burned Road
HALIFAX
West Yorkshire
HX3 7QZ
- Phone:
- 07725090524
- Email:
- joe@quad-rebuild.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window