Accounts and annual returns SOMERSET WILDLANDS

Charity number: 1191953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 22 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 22 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 17 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 17 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time