ST MARY'S PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our PTFA supports our local primary school by funding resources, equipment, and experiences which are used to support and enrich the children's learning journey throughout their time at St. Mary's School. Our committee and network of parent and staff volunteers organise several events throughout the year to raise these funds for the school, including fayres, discos, trails and community appeals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 16 November 2020: Standard registration
- ST MARY'S PTFA (Working name)
- ST MARY'S PTFA TETBURY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ellen Guichard | Chair | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grace Kirk | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trudie Jane Ellis | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rhiain Louise Clapham | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.65k | £18.62k | £10.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.35k | £7.33k | £12.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 October 2024 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARYS C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
ST. MARYS ROAD
TETBURY
GL8 8BW
- Phone:
- 01666502275
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window