ASHTON, MOULDSWORTH & HORTON CUM PEEL VILLAGE HALL CHARITABLE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a village hall for use by the inhabitants of Ashton, Mouldsworth and Horton cum Peel without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for: (a) meetings, lectures and classes, and; (b) other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 21 December 2020: Standard registration
- 14 February 2022: Funds received from 512909 ASHTON AND MOULDSWORTH VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Waring | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Ruth Lutton | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Abel | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Leo Dempsey | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tom Donnachie | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN DAVID COLVILLE | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Morris Davies | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.50k | £27.70k | £9.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10k | £10.05k | £15.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 DEC 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF ASHTON, MOULDSWORTH AND HORTON CUM PEEL WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLLICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: A) MEETINGS, LECTURE AND CLASSES, AND; B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Dairy
Ashton Hall
Kelsall Road
Ashton Hayes
CHESTER
CH3 8BH
- Phone:
- 07825785039
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window