BETHEL HOMELESS MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bethel Homeless Ministry seeks to house all individuals of the streets in the City of Birmingham, encourage independency, support these individuals by providing the right support they require when considering their basic needs, health, welfare and wellbeing, allow these individuals to contribute back to society and for those individuals to locate lost family members or bridge the gap between them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 24 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pastor Gilroy Brown | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Milton Grizzle | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.30k | £12.50k | £460 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.40k | £9.60k | £3.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS AND ROUGH SLEEPERS IN BIRMINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY WORKING WITH SUCH PEOPLE AND OTHERS TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FOOD, ITEMS, SUPPORT, EMERGENCY ACCOMMODATION, ADVICE AND SIGNPOSTING SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Wyrley Way
BIRMINGHAM
B23 7UW
- Phone:
- 07476363033
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window