CEFN MAWR PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cefn Mawr Playgroup is a Friendly secure caring and stimulating environment We are registered for up to nineteen children from ages two to four years of age The care is a daytime provision between nine am to three pm five days a week Cefn Mawr Playgroup is under a CIO but the day to day running is run by the persons in charge Suzanne Pugh and Sarah Jackson
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £103,020 from 3 government contract(s) and £1,501 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Wrexham
Governance
- 28 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chloe Wright | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Jones | Trustee | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Coral Jones | Trustee | 04 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.30k | £107.00k | £110.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.45k | £77.00k | £92.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £53.40k | £94.00k | £103.02k | |
|
Income from government grants | £300 | £11.21k | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN WALES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THEIR NEEDS THROUGH HIGH QUALITY CHILDCARE PROVISION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Activity Centre
Plas Kynaston Lane
Cefn Mawr
Wrexham
LL14 3AT
LL143AT
- Phone:
- 07591995141
- Email:
- cefnplaygroup@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window