Trustees UNIVERSITY OF CUMBRIA STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1191885

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annabelle Robinson | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Simmons | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kara Ashurst | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paula Nwachukwu | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Squire | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS MCCARTHY | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Jarnell | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susanne Parry | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.