REACHING 4 CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Reaching for Christ is a church Planting Hub (a) The advancement of the Christian faith in accordance with the Basis of Faith primarily but not exclusively within Birmingham, and the surrounding area; We provide opportunities for Christians to express & grow in their faith & for enquirers to learn more about the Christian faith; courses, teaching & education regarding the Christian faith & living
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Antonino Jorge Berrondo | Chair | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Harris | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|||||
TERRY WILBANKS | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/04/2022 | 10/04/2023 | 10/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.65k | £90.66k | £81.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.66k | £66.09k | £119.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 April 2023 | 03 November 2024 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
10 April 2023
(These accounts |
03 November 2024 | 267 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 April 2022 | 30 May 2023 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2022 | 30 May 2023 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE: A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN BIRMINGHAM, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA; WE PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR CHRISTIANS TO EXPRESS & GROW IN THEIR FAITH & FOR ENQUIRERS TO LEARN MORE ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; COURSES, TEACHING & EDUCATION REGARDING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH & LIVING; AND B) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 PETERHOUSE MEWS
WAKE GREEN ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
1
Peterhouse Mews 53 Wake Green Road
B13 9HW
- Phone:
- 07774425590
- Email:
- info@reaching4christ.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window