CASTLE BROMWICH HALL AND GARDENS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation of a Historic Garden
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £22,937 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Solihull
Governance
- 22 October 1985: Standard registration
- CASTLE BROMWICH HALL GARDENS TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sebastian Walter Lovell-Huckle | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|||||||
Bethan Collerton | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Catherine Johnson | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|||||||
George Edward Richards | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.43k | £313.30k | £364.85k | £254.39k | £280.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.04k | £230.11k | £363.75k | £336.70k | £343.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.75k | £120.00k | £37.49k | N/A | £22.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 November 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 November 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 SEPTEMBER 1985 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 OCTOBER 2004 AND 11 SEPTEMBER 2008. as amended on 07 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION AND RESTORATION OF THAT PART OF THE GARDENS ADJOINING CASTLE BROMWICH HALL IN THE COUNTY OF WEST MIDLANDS WHICH WERE CONVEYED TO THE TRUST BY A CONVEYANCE DATED 31 DECEMBER 1986 BETWEEN THE RIGHT HONOURABLE RICHARD THOMAS ORLANDO (SEVENTH) EARL OF BRADFORD THE RIGHT HONOURABLE JOANNE ELIZABETH COUNTESS OF BRADFORD AND DAVID JAMES CHALLENGER WESTON. (B) TO ACQUIRE OTHER LAND ADJOINING THE GARDENS REFERRED TO IN PARAGRAPH (A) ABOVE WHICH AT ONE TIME FORMED PART OF THE CASTLE BROMWICH HALL ESTATE IN THE COUNTY OF WEST MIDLANDS INCLUDING CASTLE BROMWICH HALL, ITS GARDENS AND THE PARKLAND ADJOINING, ALL SUCH LAND BEING SHOWN FOR THE PURPOSE OF IDENTIFICATION EDGED RED ON THE ATTACHED PLAN. (C) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION, RESTORATION OR IMPROVEMENT OF ALL LAND ACQUIRED BY THE TRUST UNDER PARAGRAPH (B) ABOVE
Area of benefit
CASTLE BROMWICH, WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CASTLE BROMWICH HALL GARDENS
CHESTER ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B369BT
- Phone:
- 0121 749 4100
- Email:
- cbhallgardens@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window