UK A CAPPELLA SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance, improve, develop, and encourage public education in, and appreciation of, the art and science of A Cappella music in all its aspects through the presentation of public concerts and recitals; through acting as a resource centre for those interested in A Cappella; by developing outreach projects to increase diversity within the form and in order to open the music to a wider audience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 April 2021: CIO registration
- UKACS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Davies | Chair | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Witham | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW KING | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £8.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £428 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND ENCOURAGE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF A CAPPELLA MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING; THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; THROUGH ACTING AS A RESOURCE CENTRE FOR THOSE INTERESTED IN A CAPPELLA; DEVELOPING OUTREACH PROJECTS TO INCREASE DIVERSITY AND OPEN THE MUSIC TO A WIDER AUDIENCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
55
Silver Spring Close
Erith
Kent
DA8 1EG
- Phone:
- 07982732090
- Email:
- ukacsinfo@gmail.com
- Website:
-
ukacappella.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window