Trustees BLOSSOM & BLOOM
Charity number: 1192507

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jodie Amanda Lawler | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Anne Jones-Wallace | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fay Margaret Lewis | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Caroline Anderson | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Parry | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa-Jayne George | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Ann Williams | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Marie Davies | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janine Claire Anderson | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.