Accounts and annual returns ELVASTON COMMUNITIES GROUP

Charity number: 1192954
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2024 13 February 2025 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2024 13 February 2025 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2023 27 January 2025 358 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 27 January 2025 358 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 April 2022 23 February 2023 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 23 February 2023 19 days late Download Open in new window