BE BLESS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the trustees have a first-hand knowledge of their dire situation. The trustees provide shelter, drinking water, tuition and to help lift many families out of poverty and the lack of food. In recent months they been providing facemasks, food, vitamins, soap and cleaning materials and also clothing to villagers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ghana
Governance
- 29 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joshua Anang | Chair | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Liliana Cadar | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Manu Dagher | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 March 2023 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 March 2023 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY COORDINATING AND DEVELOPING SERVICES SUCH AS, THE PROVISION OF TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES, FOOD, FINANCE, RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, CLEAN WATER AND SANITATION AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES FOR THOSE IN NEED AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 BENYON PATH
SOUTH OCKENDON
RM15 6PE
- Phone:
- 07555506349
- Email:
- beblesscharity10@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window