TALENT BEYOND BOUNDARIES UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Talent Beyond Boundaries UK works with employers, businesses, community led organisations, charities and other partners to support refugees and other displaced people access skilled employment and migration pathways to the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£894,773
Donations and legacies | £894.77k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£902,502
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £902.50k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £472,745 from 10 government contract(s) and £80,500 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £902.50k |
People

10 Employee(s)
3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 February 2021: CIO registration
- TALENT BEYOND BOUNDARIES (Previous name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Cameron | Chair | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Cameron | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Robinson | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £370.43k | £546.85k | £894.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £267.56k | £479.18k | £902.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £267.16k | N/A | £472.75k | |
|
Income from government grants | £69.07k | £420.30k | £80.50k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £101.55k | £894.77k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £445.31k | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £479.18k | £902.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £350.93k | £207.30k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £174.38k | £38.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: (1) RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT, POVERTY, DISTRESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF FORCIBLY DISPLACED PERSONS, PRINCIPALLY BY PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING SKILLED LABOUR MOBILITY PATHWAYS TO ENABLE RESETTLEMENT OF SUCH PERSONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM; (2) PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG FORCIBLY DISPLACED PERSONS WHO HAVE RESETTLED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED DUE TO THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION OR OTHERWISE DUE TO THEIR STATUS AS A FORCIBLY DISPLACED PERSON. IN THESE OBJECTS, FORCIBLY DISPLACED PERSONS MEANS INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE BEEN FORCIBLY DISPLACED FROM THEIR HOME COUNTRY DUE TO PHYSICAL DANGERS, CONFLICT, GENERALIZED VIOLENCE, HUMAN RIGHTS VIOLATIONS OR PERSECUTION, INCLUDING REFUGEES AND THOSE IN REFUGEE-LIKE CIRCUMSTANCES SUCH AS STATELESS PERSONS AND PERSONS SEEKING ASYLUM, AND THEIR DEPENDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 Wallis Road
LONDON
Studio B08
E9 5LN
- Phone:
- +447467862321
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window