HONG KONG ASSISTANCE AND RESETTLEMENT COMMUNITY (HKARC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assistance and resettlement for Hongkongers in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 September 2021: Standard registration
- HKARC (Working name)
- HONG KONG ARC (Working name)
- HONG KONG ASSISTANCE AND RESETTLEMENT COMMUNITY (ARC) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hiu Yeung Benjamin LEE | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cham Wai Fung | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wai Fun Fermi Wong | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
LUKE DE PULFORD | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|||||
BENEDICT RICHARD VICTOR ROGERS | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA CATRIONA MACBEAN | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £8.51k | £8.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £8.51k | £8.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 October 2024 | 268 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 AUG 2021
Charitable objects
2.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 2.1.1 TO RELIEVE POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION) AMONGST THOSE FROM HONG KONG LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, INCLUDING GRANTS, ADVOCACY, HOUSING, ADVICE, SUPPORT IN FINDING EMPLOYMENT, AND EDUCATION, TO THOSE IN NEED; 2.1.2 TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY BY REASON OF FACTORS INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) UNEMPLOYMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR NEED RELATED TO IMMIGRATION (IN PARTICULAR, THOSE RESETTLING IN THE UK FROM HONG KONG); 2.1.3 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF FREE LEGAL ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS WHO, THROUGH LACK OF MEANS, WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH ADVICE; 2.1.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY REFERRING OR FACILITATING ACCESS TO MEDICAL SERVICES; 2.1.5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE PROCESS AND EXPERIENCE OF MIGRATION AND RESETTLEMENT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO HONGKONGERS, INCLUDING BY CARRYING OUT RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Coral Street
LONDON
SE1 7BE
- Phone:
- 07827574936
- Email:
- contact@hongkong-arc.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window