Wilmslow High School Parent Partners

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to provide additional resources, equipment and facilities for WHS & its students. Resources may include student rewards & funding towards clubs and wellbeing. During 2021/22 the Charity will continue to support school & students affected by the Covid-19 pandemic. The Charity works closely with the school's Senior Leadership Team to ensure funds are spend fairly & transparently.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 06 October 1986: Standard registration
- WILMSLOW COUNTY HIGH SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- WILMSLOW HIGH SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Elizabeth Foster | Chair | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Burge | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eve Victoria Edghill | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Christian Vincent | Trustee | 16 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.95k | £8.71k | £20.27k | £16.16k | £18.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117 | £11.44k | £36.68k | £6.14k | £21.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 July 2021 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 09 July 2021 | 404 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 SEPTEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED ON 21 SEPTEMBER 1995 as amended on 06 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WILMSLOW HIGH SCHOOL
HOLLY ROAD
WILMSLOW
SK9 1LZ
- Phone:
- 01625 526191
- Email:
- rguyett@wilmslowhigh.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window