SHEFFIELD THROMBOSIS HAEMOSTASIS TRUST

Charity number: 516896
Charity reporting is overdue by 939 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a Sheffield-based charitable trust, set up to benefit the research into thrombosis and haemostasis.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £414

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 October 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr STEPHEN KITCHEN Trustee
INTERNATIONAL COUNCIL FOR STANDARDIZATION IN HAEMATOLOGY
Received: On time
TIMOTHY ALAN LOUIS WOODS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £0 £10 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £4.37k £1.88k £414 £414 £414
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 208 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 208 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 574 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 574 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 939 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 939 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 November 2021 369 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3RD FLOOR
PEGASUS HOUSE
463A GLOSSOP ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S10 2QD
Phone:
01142673312
Website:

No information available