THE PEOPLE'S PANTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 13 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Davidson | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Maureen Slater | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Karen Elizabeth Berry BSc (Hons) | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE POVERTY FOR PERSONS, INCLUDING THOSE THAT ARE IN TEMPORARY FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN MARKET WEIGHTON, POCKLINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) RUNNING A FOOD BANK AND PANTRY, KNOWN AS ‘THE PEOPLE’S PANTRY’, PROVIDING FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. (B) SUCH OTHER MEANS INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
The People's Pantry
The Acorns Community Hub
76 Market Place
Market Weighton
East Yorkshire
YO43 3AW
- Phone:
- 07740998581
- Email:
- info@thepeoplespantry.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window