ROYAL HALLAMSHIRE HOSPITAL LEUKAEMIA AND MYELOMA RESEARCH TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable fund provides support for research into serious blood diseases, funds are also used for direct patient benefit - wards O2, P3 and P4
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 16 October 1985: Standard registration
- 08 March 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 08 March 2016: Funds transferred to 1059043 SHEFFIELD HOSPITALS CHARITABLE TRUST AND RELATED C...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.53k | £4.92k | £6.75k | £19.63k | £37.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.47k | £2.96k | £13.17k | £39.86k | £27.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 01 February 2016 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2015
(These accounts |
01 February 2016 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 03 February 2015 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 27 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 24 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 SEPTEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
1. TO FINANCE RESEARCH AT THE ROYAL HALLAMSHIRE HOSPITAL SHEFFIELD INTO ALL FORMS OF LEUKAEMIA AND MEYLOMA. 2. TO DISSEMINATE AND MAKE PUBLIC THE RESULTS FINDINGS OR CONCLUSIONS OF THE SAID RESEARCH WHETHER BY WAY OF PUBLICATION IN SCIENTIFIC MEDICAL OR OTHER JOURNALS BY CONFERENCES SEMINARS LECTURES OR COURSES OR OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window