EDUCATIONAL WEALTH FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE AND ENHANCE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION FOR STUDENTS IN MAINTAINED EDUCATION THROUGH THE AWARDING OF GRANTS FOR INSPIRATIONAL PROJECTS AND RESOURCES INCLUDING BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO ENVIRONMENTAL, MENTAL HEALTH, CREATIVE ARTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 13 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 November 2020: CIO registration
- EWF (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sam Mills | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Henry Hamilton Houldsworth | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Crocker | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yoseph Araya | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Stuart Young | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/10/2021 | 13/10/2022 | 13/10/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 October 2023 | 11 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 October 2023 | 11 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 October 2022 | 13 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 October 2022 | 13 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 October 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 October 2021 | 04 January 2023 | 144 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND ENHANCE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION FOR STUDENTS IN MAINTAINED EDUCATION THROUGH THE AWARDING OF GRANTS FOR INSPIRATIONAL PROJECTS AND RESOURCES INCLUDING BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO ENVIRONMENTAL, MENTAL HEALTH, CREATIVE ARTS AND HUMAN RIGHTS TOPICS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Bath House & Community Centre
205 Stratford Road
Wolverton
MILTON KEYNES
MK12 5RL
- Phone:
- 07986511330
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window