THE SAVED TO SERVE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relieving need hardship and distress either in gifts in kind or grants of money. The area of benefit of the trust are the Boroughs of Rushcliffe and Broxtow and the city of Nottingham and also elsewhere in Great Britain and Overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 21 October 1985: Standard registration
- THE HONEYCOMB CHRISTIAN CHARITY SHOP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHRIS PARTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JULIAN DAVID EVE | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY PRIOR | Trustee | 07 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE KYTHREOTIS | Trustee | 18 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
KIRSTEN BAIRSTOW ROBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZOE ANNE PARTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALMA ANN MORLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.30k | £35.82k | £31.36k | £39.70k | £42.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.92k | £28.77k | £34.07k | £40.33k | £43.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 SEPTEMBER 1985 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED OF 13TH JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT EITHER IN GIFTS OR KIND OR GRANTS OF MONEY.
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGHS OF RUSHCLIFFE AND BROXTOWE AND THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 CHURCH STREET
RUDDINGTON
NOTTINGHAM
NG11 6HA
- Phone:
- 01159847022
- Website:
-
ruddington.com/honeycomb
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window