THE GENERAL AND MUNICIPAL WORKERS VICKERS TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Cumbria
Governance
- 21 October 1985: Standard registration
- 25 June 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 30 June 1997: Standard registration
- 19 August 2004: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH DECEMBER 1983.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE MENTALLY AND / OR PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED AGED SICK AND INFIRM PERSONS RESIDENT WITHIN A FIFTEEEN MILES RADIUS OF THE TOWN HALL AT BARROW IN FURNESS IN THE COUNTY OF CUMBRIA EITHER BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR GIFT IN KIND TO SUCH INDIVIDUALS QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID OR BY MAKING GRANTS TO ANY OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window