TIGERS GOOD KARMA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving support and comfort to those in need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAM LEVETT | Chair | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Verrinder | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harmony Hurst | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 March 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN BRIGHTON BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING FOOD, DRINK, SHELTER, WARMTH, FOOD, COMPANIONSHIP, ADVICE, SIGNPOSTING AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 2
IMBERHORNE WAY
EAST GRINSTEAD
RH19 1RL
- Phone:
- 07932212218
- Email:
- tigersgoodkarma@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window