MERCY FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mercy Foundation Trust is a UK based charity that promotes General Health and well being through Free health promotion Seminars and Workshops aimed at preventing diabetes, obesity, high blood pressure, high cholesterol levels, thereby reducing the incidence of strokes and heart attacks. Most of our volunteers are healthcare professionals who would give free professional advice at the workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 13 October 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE NKOLE | Chair | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Samson Egbulonu Dr | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chinedu Nkole Dr | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARIA MOORE | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 219 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 31 July 2024 | 305 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 585 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF PRAYER LINES, CHRISTIAN HEALING ROOMS, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, PASTORAL COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT, AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HEALTH CARE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE SUBJECT OF DISEASE PREVENTION AND HEALTHY LIFESTYLES BY DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE AND PROVIDING HEALTH SEMINARS AND WEBINARS. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
334 Canford Lane
BRISTOL
BS9 3PW
- Phone:
- 01172443062
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window