THE THREE ARCH BRIDGE COMMUNITY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Maple Hall is a Community Hall on the Three Arch Bridge Estate in Brentwood Essex. The Hall was built in 1953 by the residents of the Estate and hosts a wide variety of activities for the benefit of the local residents. We cater for children's nurseries to old time dancing, Karate, Judo, Yoga, dog training and more including free facilities for NFP groups. We run a digital inclusion programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 25 November 2020: CIO registration
- MAPLE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Rodell | Chair | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Miseon Kang | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Emanuel | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Minns | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.23k | £9.91k | £12.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.91k | £15.96k | £12.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 January 2024 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 January 2024 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE THREE ARCH BRIDGE ESTATEA ND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING FOR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND ALL OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, SOCIAL WELFARE AND PHYSICAL AND MENTAL EXERCISE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maple Hall
Maple Close
Brentwood
CM13 2EA
- Phone:
- 07512728980
- Email:
- paul@maplehall.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window