TRIUMPH OF GRACE MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith and improve social conditions through charitable purposes in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 November 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christian Idahosa | Chair | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
EMILY SARAH WALKER | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dave Idahosa | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gladys Foday-Akay | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.64k | £23.55k | £44.95k | £18.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.66k | £14.58k | £34.81k | £23.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 FEB 2020 as amended on 22 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
To advance the Christian faith in UK and overseas for the benefit of the public through the holding of prayer meetings, lectures public celebration of religious festivals producing and/or distributing literature on the Christian faith to enlighten others about the Christian faith.
Contact information
- Address:
-
197 Sutton Road
Maidstone
ME15 9BT
- Phone:
- 01622 951295
- Email:
- info@triumphofgrace.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window