Accounts and annual returns RED BOX PROJECT

Charity Number: 1192039
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 17 August 2024 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 17 August 2024 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 25 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 25 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 28 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 28 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window