COLCHESTER MUSEUMS DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Colchester Museums Development Foundation supports Colchester Museums to inspire and enrich the local community, through the preservation, exploration, and sharing of the town's heritage. The Foundation raises funds through donations, memberships and grants to support access, inclusion, community collaboration, and engagement with collections across Colchester Museums.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Essex
Governance
- 27 October 2020: CIO registration
- CMDF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Penelope Weaver | Chair | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Stephanie Rickard | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Fern Lovett | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Ilaria Boncori | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|||||||
David Hedges | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Paul Lynn | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Edward Cheeseman | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Nicholas Paul Wickenden MA,AMA,FSA | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
DENISE FIENNES | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Glynis Ann Barritt | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Philip Antony Berners | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Francis Hargrave | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.92k | £18.72k | £29.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.60k | £7.70k | £26.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PARTICULARLY IN THE SUBJECTS OF THE ARTS, ARCHAEOLOGY, NATURAL HISTORY, HISTORY AND SCIENCE; AND II) PROMOTING AND DEVELOPING COLCHESTER CASTLE, HOLLYTREES MUSEUM, THE NATURAL HISTORY MUSEUM AND THEIR COLLECTIONS AND STORAGE FACILITIES, AS WELL AS SUPPORTING PARTNER ORGANISATIONS TO DELIVER RELATED PROJECTS AND ACTIVITIES, PARTICULARLY WHERE THEY ADVANCE THE MUSEUMS ENGAGEMENT WITH THEIR LOCAL COMMUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
COLCHESTER CITY COUNCIL
ROWAN HOUSE
33 SHEEPEN ROAD
COLCHESTER
CO3 3WG
- Phone:
- 01206282931
- Email:
- cmdf@colchester.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window