BETHEL BAPTIST CHAPEL

Charity number: 1192188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN BATH, THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD AND GLOBALLY (2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE MANAGING TRUSTEES FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £51,528
Total expenditure: £54,796

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 November 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Julian Reeves Goodman Chair 13 November 2019
CHARITY OF SARAH ANNE CHAPMAN
Received: On time
John Gaskell Trustee 13 November 2019
None on record
John Benjamin Gaskell Trustee 13 November 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £25.41k £26.71k £51.53k
Total expenditure £26.80k £24.63k £54.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BETHEL BAPTIST CHURCH
ST. JOHNS ROAD
BATHWICK
BATH
BA2 6PX
Phone:
01225852708