DUKE OF NORFOLK (CONTROLLED) PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the work of the Duke of Norfolk Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 21 October 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katy Taylor | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Neal | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Vasey | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Catherine Lingham | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Broadbent | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Kidman | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Ann Lynch | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aikaterini Betsou | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.04k | £935 | £4.33k | £19.09k | £16.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.84k | £5.53k | £3.54k | £8.99k | £10.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 January 2023 | 208 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 10 SEPTEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL. (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Duke of Norfolk C of E Primary
Royle Avenue
GLOSSOP
SK13 7RD
- Phone:
- 01457 867954
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window