SANTA MARTA GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Santa Marta Group is a human rights charity, rooted in the Catholic Church, working with people of all faiths and none, which recognises the structural nature of modern slavery and human trafficking and works to end it. It seeks to mobilise the energies and commitment of law enforcement and civil society to eradicate modern slavery and human trafficking.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£536,834
Donations and legacies | £536.83k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£485,192
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £485.19k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £485.19k | |
Retained for future use | £51.64k |
People

4 Employee(s)
4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Germany
- Ireland
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 26 April 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOST REVEREND VINCENT GERARD NICHOLS | Chair | 23 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Sir Iain Livingstone | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rt Rev Leonard William Kenney | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
ADRIAN RADFORD | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £284.06k | £388.50k | £536.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.96k | £440.77k | £485.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £536.83k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £485.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £194.83k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £16.36k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 May 2025 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 May 2025 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 09 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS, IN RELATION TO THOSE AFFECTED BY OR IN THE FIGHT TO SUPPRESS HUMAN TRAFFICKING (AS SET OUT AND DEFINED IN THE UN CONVENTION AGAINST TRANSNATIONAL ORGANIZED CRIME (ADOPTED BY GENERAL ASSEMBLY RESOLUTION 55/25 ON 15 NOVEMBER 2000) AND FURTHER SUPPLEMENTED BY THE PROTOCOL TO PREVENT, SUPPRESS AND PUNISH TRAFFICKING IN PERSONS, ESPECIALLY WOMEN AND CHILDREN (DATED 12 DECEMBER 2000), THE COUNCIL OF EUROPE CONVENTION ON TRAFFICKING IN HUMAN BEINGS (DATED 16 MAY 2005) AND THE MODERN SLAVERY ACT (2015)) THROUGHOUT THE UK AND INTERNATIONALLY BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A. PREVENTING HUMAN TRAFFICKING AND MODERN SLAVERY THROUGH PARTNERSHIPS, RESEARCH AND AWARENESS RAISING; B. PROVIDING ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN TRAFFICKING AND ASSOCIATED HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS AND LEGISLATION; C. PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR THE ABOLITION OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING AND MODERN SLAVERY; D. PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; E. HELPING ELIMINATE THE CONDITIONS THAT GIVE RISE TO MODERN SLAVERY AND HUMAN TRAFFICKING. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DIOCESE OF WESTMINSTER
VAUGHAN HOUSE
46 FRANCIS STREET
LONDON
SW1P 1QN
- Phone:
- 0207 798 9039
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window