Financial history ACORN VENTURE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 516925
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £603.73k £382.07k £485.30k £706.46k £653.01k
Total expenditure £606.90k £363.69k £339.38k £440.31k £471.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £44.94k N/A N/A £60.77k £7.45k
Income - Other trading activities £219.71k N/A N/A £290.83k £268.07k
Income - Charitable activities £295.65k N/A N/A £309.44k £346.64k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £43.44k N/A N/A £45.42k £30.58k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £279
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £593.72k N/A N/A £429.12k £465.69k
Expenditure - Raising funds £13.18k N/A N/A £11.20k £6.12k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0