Trustees ACORN VENTURE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 516925

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER JOHN RODERICK | Chair | 16 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Hartshorne | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Terence Muspratt | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter Ware | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Aiden Daniel Burke | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Vivian Rishworth | Trustee | 04 December 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.