DIGITAL ANTHROPOLOGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Digital Anthropology (DA) is a charity dedicated to supporting vulnerable groups and those in employment impacted by Digital Workers. DA partners with organizations to foster more inclusive workplaces by integrating the fusion of digital and human workers. Focusing on Diversity, Equity, and Inclusion (DEI), DA ensures that digital transformation benefits everyone, promoting sustainable and ethical
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 June 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD SKELLETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jatinder Sahi | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Skellett | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nerys Mutlow | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.50k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.21k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 December 2024 | 598 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 JUN 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 AUG 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 SEP 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECTS CLAUSE IN THE ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION SHALL BE AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE USE AND IMPLEMENTATION OF AUTOMATION TECHNOLOGIES IN THE WORKPLACE AND ITS IMPACT AND EFFECT ON THE WORKFORCE 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS DISPLACED OR IN DANGER OF BEING DISPLACED BY THE INTRODUCTION OF AUTOMATION TECHNOLOGIES INCLUDING BY THE PROVISION OF SCHEMES FOR RETRAINING 3. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT OF THOSE DISPLACED BY AUTOMATION TECHNOLOGIES 4. THE PROMOTION OF ETHICAL STANDARDS IN BUSINESS WITH A VIEW TO ENSURING THE PROMOTION OF ETHICAL PRINCIPLES, POLICIES AND PROCEDURES IN INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE AND ENSURING THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF PEOPLE WHOSE CURRENT AND FUTURE EMPLOYMENT IS AT RISK OF REPLACEMENT BY AUTOMATION TECHNOLOGY AND ALSO THE SOCIAL OBLIGATION OF PERSONS ENGAGED IN INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE TOWARDS THE WELFARE OF THOSE PEOPLE AT RISK, IN PARTICULAR BY: A) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES SURROUNDING AUTOMATION TECHNOLOGIES AND WHICH ROLES WILL BE AFFECTED; B) SIGNPOSTING TO INFORMATION, BY DEVELOPING AN ONGOING AND EVER DEVELOPING KNOWLEDGE PORTAL THAT PROVIDES THE LATEST TRENDS, SYNTHESISES RESEARCH AND PROFILES CASE STUDIES; C) BUILDING A COMMUNITY OF PARTNERS, DEVELOPING WHOLE-OF SOCIETY/ CROSS-SECTOR DISCUSSIONS ON WAYS TO PREVENT NEGATIVE OUTCOMES OF AUTOMATION TECHNOLOGIES THROUGH ROUNDTABLES AND ENGAGEMENT ACTIVITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
20-22 Wenlock Road
London
N1 7GU
- Phone:
- 01494898058
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window