Governing document NORTHWICH AND DISTRICT HERITAGE SOCIETY
Charity number: 516930

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSITUTION ADOPTED 26 SEPTEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED 15 DECEMBER 1986 AND 28 MAY 1987 AND 21 MAY 1993 AS AMENDED ON THE 21ST MAY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE GREATER AWARENESS AND THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION OF THE HISTORICAL, ARCHAEOLOGICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL HERITAGE OF THE AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND ESPECIALLY THE INHABITANTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NORTHWICH AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.