ABBEY ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Baptist Church which serves the Community. We have times of worship, Bible studies, Prayer Meetings, Toddler Groups, Soup Lunch, After School Club, Brunch Clubs during the school holidays, Gardening group Barrow Food Bank, Recreation activities - Brownies, dance group, music rehearsals and shows. Training - Casualty Union, Assistance Dog training. Children's Parties
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 02 November 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janice Linda Arthur BSc MCSP | Chair | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Spedding | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mary Bailey RGN | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.04k | £54.17k | £76.82k | £75.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.22k | £57.32k | £74.07k | £67.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 04 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 OCT 1951
Charitable objects
A BAPTIST CHURCH - A PLACE OF PUBLIC WORSHIP, A PLACE FOR THE INSTRUCTION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS OR THE PROMOTION OF OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES. AS A PLACE FOR THE MAINTAINING AND PRACTISING THE DOCTRINE AND RITE OF THE BAPTISM OF BELIEVERS AND NO OTHER BAPTISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ABBEY ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH
THE CORNER OF ABBEY RD AND PARK DR
BARROW-IN-FURNESS
LA13 9BD
- Phone:
- 07885690771
- Email:
- macooper45@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window