SANSKRITI (READING)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sanskriti organise various Indian/Bengali festivities to highlight the multi-cultural facet of the Indian communityin UK, provide the Indian/Bengali community the opportunity to experience Indian/Bengali heritage and festivities away from their homeland and enhance social bonding and provide financial support and relief of poverty among disadvantaged children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Reading
- India
Governance
- 05 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSHMITA BANERJEE | Trustee | 23 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
JAY SINHA | Trustee | 23 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
SOMNATH MITRA | Trustee | 23 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
DIBYENDU BHATTACHARYA | Trustee | 23 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
DOLAN MAJUMDER | Trustee | 23 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
SANJOY SARKAR | Trustee | 23 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
SANTANU BASU | Trustee | 23 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
BEDANUJ DASGUPTA | Trustee | 23 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
SOUMITRA ROY | Trustee | 23 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.05k | £31.10k | £29.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.96k | £32.02k | £28.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £344 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UK IN INDIAN CULTURE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRADITIONAL INDIAN CULTURAL EVENTS. B) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN INDIA BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO CHARITIES FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 TAMARIND WAY
EARLEY
READING
RG6 5GR
- Phone:
- 07931195306
- Email:
- mitrasom@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window