Accounts and annual returns BARBADOS ASSOCIATION (LEEDS BRANCH)

Charity number: 516938
Charity reporting is overdue by 1112 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 381 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 381 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 747 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 747 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1112 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1112 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 09 March 2022 313 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required